FL H1237 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-188, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises & provides requirements relating to condominiums, including kickbacks, association documents, attorney representation, recordkeeping requirements, purchasing of units at foreclosure sale, financial statements, powers & duties of Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, & Mobile Homes, board membership, management services, conflicts of interest, arbitration, member voting rights, & reporting requirements; provides criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominiums

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#336 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27 Chapter No. 2017-188, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161)
2017-06-26 Approved by Governor
2017-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2017-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-01SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1682
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules
2017-04-28SenateReceived
2017-04-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules
2017-04-28SenateIn Messages
2017-04-28HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2017-04-28HouseAmendment(s) adopted (305075, 798267)
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-24HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-24HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-20HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2017-04-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/20/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-03-23HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2017-03-23HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2017-03-23HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules and Policy Committee
2017-03-22HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-21HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-03-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-03-10HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Rules and Policy Committee; Judiciary Committee
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1682 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188), HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161)
S294 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161), CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188)
H653 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188), HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161), CS/SB 1520 (Ch. 2017-122)
S744 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188), HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161), CS/SB 1520 (Ch. 2017-122)
H6027 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-161, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7181255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718129Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7183025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7183027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7185012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71871Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Amendment/694907/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Amendment/071799/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Amendment/540335/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Amendment/504649/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Amendment/401725/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Amendment/132849/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Amendment/798267/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Amendment/305075/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Amendment/450089/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Amendment/187977/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Vote/HouseVote_h01237c2336.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1237/Vote/SenateVote_h01237e1006.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback