FL S0738 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that nonindustrial stormwater management systems be designed with side slopes that meet certain minimum design requirements; revising construction relating to causes of action for damages to real or personal property directly resulting from certain discharges or other conditions of pollution, etc.
Title
Environmental Management
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Senate Environment and Natural Resources Committee | Sen. Daniel Burgess [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Messages |
2024-02-29 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-29 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 7 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (396758) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 3 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S406 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
H789 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
H789 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 4131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |