FL S0738 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to repeal the class size limits.
Title
Class Size Limits In Public Schools/Repeal [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00054 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2009-11-17 | Filed |