FL S0732 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/19/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Hearing: Jan 19 @ 8:30 am in 110 Senate Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing responsibilities for certain employers and employees; providing an exception; requiring employers to provide annual training for employees and supervisors; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, in conjunction with the Department of Health, to adopt specified rules, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Heat Illness Prevention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/19/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-11-16SenateReferred to Agriculture; Health Policy; Rules
2021-11-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H887 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
448111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback