FL S0720 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a qualified patient to designate more than one caregiver to assist with the qualified patient's medical use of marijuana under certain circumstances; authorizing a county-designated caregiver to register as a caregiver for more than one qualified patient under certain circumstances; providing a procedure for a parent of a student who is a qualified patient to request that marijuana be administered to the student during the school day; requiring that a caregiver or a county-designated caregiver administering marijuana to the student do so in the area the school principal designates, etc.
Title
Medical Use of Marijuana in Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Education; Rules |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 9867 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/720 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/720/BillText/Filed/HTML |