FL S0716 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising county boundaries, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Boundaries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#668 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10 Chapter No. 2020-18
2020-06-09 Approved by Governor
2020-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-10SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-10HousePassed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2020-03-10HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-09HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-09HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-06HouseReceived
2020-03-06HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-06HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-03HouseIn Messages
2020-02-26SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-02-19SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-17SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-12SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-03SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-03SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-28SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-01-27SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-10-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H345 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 716 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
759Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback