FL H0345 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 716 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 716 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises county boundaries.
Title
County Boundaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 716 passed |
2020-02-26 | House | CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to- Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Original reference(s) removed: State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-25 | House | CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/25/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-10-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S716 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-18
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
7 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |