FL S0716 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Now in Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Donated Dental Services Act"; establishing the Dental Student Loan Repayment Program to support dentists who practice in public health programs located in certain underserved areas; requiring the Department of Health to establish the Donated Dental Services Program to provide comprehensive dental care to certain eligible individuals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H465 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3814019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38140195Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback