FL S0716 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain animal medical records held by a state college of veterinary medicine that is accredited by the American Veterinary Medical Association Council on Education; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Animal Medical Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#311 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-62
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-23HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 1287
2015-04-22HouseReceived
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-22HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-22HouseIn Messages
2015-04-22SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
2015-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-09SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-04-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-04-02SenateNow in Rules
2015-04-01SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2015-04-01SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-31SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2015-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/31/15, 10:30 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-03-23SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2015-03-23SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2015-03-23SenateRemaining references corrected to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2015-03-23SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Higher Education
2015-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-18SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/18/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-13SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Higher Education; Rules
2015-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1287 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 716 (Ch. 2015-62)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
474203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4742167Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback