FL S0714 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Regulated Industries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the department to certify for licensure qualified individuals who practice mold assessment or mold remediation and hold certain licenses issued by other states or territories; requiring the department to certify asbestos consultants and asbestos contractors for licensure who meet certain exam and other state licensure requirements; removing a time limitation for applying for certain contracting licenses under certain provisions; deleting a requirement limiting the types of boxing exhibitions which require a specified maximum difference in participant weights, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Business and Professional Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-11-16SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2021-11-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H667 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4688414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548043Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback