FL S0702 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a district school board may adopt policies for releasing students for the school lunch period; requiring schools in certain districts to obtain parental consent before permitting students to leave school grounds during the lunch period, etc.
Title
Students Remaining on School Grounds During School Hours
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Community Affairs; Rules |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0729 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/702 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0702/BillText/Filed/HTML |