FL S0700 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to reimburse the use of telehealth services under certain circumstances and subject to certain limitations; authorizing telehealth providers to prescribe specified controlled substances through telehealth under certain circumstances; authorizing registered pharmacy technicians to compound and dispense medicinal drugs under certain circumstances; exempting certain registered pharmacy technicians from specified prohibitions; providing additional long-acting medications pharmacists may administer under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Telehealth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/08/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/17/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H247 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
S660 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
H957 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
H1477 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S1568 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages
S660 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
H957 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
H1477 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S1568 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 347 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0198 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 1893 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 0501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |