FL S0700 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes district school boards to adopt resolutions that allow prayers of invocation or benediction at secondary school events. Provides legislative intent. Provides for severability.
Title
Education
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Siplin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-03 | Withdrawn from Judiciary -SJ 725 | |
2011-04-14 | Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 04/14/11, 9:15 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-31 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 04/05/11, 1:15 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-03-25 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/30/11, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 57 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Judiciary; Rules -SJ 57 | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0309 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/700 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0700/BillText/Filed/HTML |