FL H0309 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes district school boards to adopt resolutions that allow prayers of invocation or benediction at secondary school events.
Title
Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 31 | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 31 | |
2011-01-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0700 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/309 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0309/BillText/Filed/HTML |