FL S0692 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 595
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 595
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Removes a requirement that the Agency for Health Care Administration disseminate annually a printed list of assisted living facilities sanctioned or fined to specified agencies and departments. Removes reporting requirements for assisted living facilities relating to liability claims. Removes an obsolete reporting requirement. Removes a provision requiring the Department of Elderly Affairs to submit to the Legislature for review and comment a copy of proposed department rules establishing standards for resident care, etc.
Title
Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -SJ 595 | |
2011-04-27 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-26 | CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/26/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-13 | Now in Rules -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-04-05 | Now in Health Regulation -SJ 322 | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 322 | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/04/11, 3:15 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 57 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Regulation; Rules -SJ 57 | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4049 () 2011-04-14 - Original bill laid on Table, under Rule 7.19(a), refer to combined CS/HB 4045, HB 4047, HB 4049, HB 4051, HB 4053 (Vetoed by Governor)
S1458 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1458 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
429 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |