FL S0690 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to require that any proposals to revise the State Constitution, or any part thereof, filed by the Taxation and Budget Reform Commission be limited to a single subject, etc.
Title
Single Subject Limitation for Taxation and Budget Reform Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Messages |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/21/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Now in Ethics and Elections |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H53 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar