FL S0680 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a state university to calculate an excess hour threshold for each student based on specified criteria; providing that the excess hour threshold may be adjusted only under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excess Credit Hour Surcharges

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-04-04SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/04/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-12SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H257 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1009286Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback