FL H0257 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each state university to calculate excess hour threshold for each student; requires such threshold to be adjusted under certain circumstances; prohibits such threshold from being adjusted under certain circumstances; revises threshold for assessing excess credit hour surcharge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excess Credit Hour Surcharges

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#130 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-03HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseCS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-18HouseNow in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-13HouseCS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S680 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1009286Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback