FL S0670 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Ratifying a specified rule relating to supplemental regulatory measures for the minimum flows and levels of Silver Springs, designated as an Outstanding Florida Spring under s. 373.802(4), F.S., for the sole and exclusive purpose of satisfying any condition on effectiveness pursuant to specified provisions which requires ratification of any rule meeting any specified thresholds of likely adverse impact or increase in regulatory costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ratification of Rules of the St. Johns River Water Management District

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 7035
2018-02-21SenateSubstituted HB 7035
2018-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-07SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 1
2018-02-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/07/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-09SenateFavorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/09/18, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Rules
2017-10-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7035 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-41

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback