FL S0670 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratifying a specified rule relating to supplemental regulatory measures for the minimum flows and levels of Silver Springs, designated as an Outstanding Florida Spring under s. 373.802(4), F.S., for the sole and exclusive purpose of satisfying any condition on effectiveness pursuant to specified provisions which requires ratification of any rule meeting any specified thresholds of likely adverse impact or increase in regulatory costs, etc.
Title
Ratification of Rules of the St. Johns River Water Management District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7035 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Substituted HB 7035 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/07/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/09/18, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Rules |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7035 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-41
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/670 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/670/BillText/Filed/HTML |