FL H7035 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies specified rule relating to implementation of district's prevention strategy to address Silver Springs minimum flows & water levels, for sole & exclusive purpose of satisfying any condition on effectiveness pursuant to s. 120.541(3), F.S., which requires ratification of any rule exceeding specified thresholds for likely adverse impact or increase in regulatory costs.
Title
Ratification of St. Johns River Water Management District Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#544 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#544 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Chapter No. 2018-41 | |
2018-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-02-27 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Substituted for SB 670 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Rules |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Rules |
2018-02-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18 |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/18/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S670 (Similar To) 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7035