FL S0666 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Transfers and reassigns certain functions and responsibilities, including records, personnel, property, and unexpended balances of appropriations and other resources, from the Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to the Department of Gaming Control. Requires the department to issue advisory opinions under certain circumstances. Provides for the Department of Gaming Control or the Department of Legal Affairs, to prosecute a fair association for illegal gambling activities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governmental Reorganization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-05-05 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/06/11
2011-05-04 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/05/11
2011-05-03 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/11
2011-05-02 Placed on Consent Calendar, 05/03/11 --Removed from Calendar
2011-04-26 Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 -SJ 469
2011-04-21 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/26/11, 9:45 am, 412 Knott Building
2011-04-05 CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time -SJ 339
2011-04-01 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-30 CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 323
2011-03-25 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/30/11, 3:45 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-03-11 Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 186
2011-03-10 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-09 CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 186
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 54
2011-03-04 On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/09/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-02-09 Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 54
2011-01-27 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0668 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0217 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0576 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28571Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285710Amended CodeSee Bill Text
455116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55024055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55026165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55026352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550334Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550375Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5505251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5511045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
616241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81737Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8490915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849094Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849161Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback