FL H0217 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creates "Simulated Gambling Prohibition & Community Protection Act"; prohibits use of simulated gambling devices to conduct or promote game promotions, drawings, & games of chance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibition of Simulated Gambling Devices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-01 Original reference(s) removed: Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2011-03-31 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-03-22 CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5 -HJ 391
2011-03-18 PCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 24
2011-02-01 Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 24
2011-01-14 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0576 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0666 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65550Amended CodeSee Bill Text
721111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8490935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849094Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84919Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
896101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90534Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback