FL S0660 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "veterans' assistance education programs"; requiring the Department of the Lottery to create an instant-ticket lottery game that benefits veterans' assistance education programs; providing that veterans' assistance education programs may be funded by the Educational Enhancement Trust Fund, etc.
Title
State Lottery Funding for Veterans' Assistance Education Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Collins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H417 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 1215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/660 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/660/BillText/Filed/HTML |