FL S0660 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Law Enforcement to create statewide policies and procedures regarding contact with alleged victims, or their representatives, concerning sexual offense evidence kits; requiring the department to ensure that law enforcement agencies adopt the statewide policies and procedures; specifying requirements for the policies and procedures; requiring that each alleged victim of a sexual offense be notified of specified rights, etc.
Title
Sexual Offense Victim Rights
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/660 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/660/BillText/Filed/HTML |