FL S0650 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Now in Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Renaming the natural gas fuel fleet vehicle rebate program as the alternative fuel fleet vehicle rebate program; revising the program to include rebates for certain fleet vehicles powered by alternative fuels, rather than only for fleet vehicles fueled by natural gas; requiring such fleet vehicles to comply with specified emission standards, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative Fuel Fleet Vehicle Rebates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2024-01-24SenateFavorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2024-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2024-01-10SenateNow in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2024-01-10SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2024-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building
2023-12-13SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
2023-11-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H803 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
377810Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback