FL S0650 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing requirements for tethering domestic dogs and cats; authorizing enforcement of the act in accordance with specified provisions, etc.
Title
Tethering of Domestic Dogs and Cats
Sponsors
Senate Agriculture Committee | Sen. Annette Taddeo [D] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] |
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] | Sen. Shevrin Jones [D] | Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
Sen. Linda Stewart [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/03/21, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H177 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee