FL S0638 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Florida Hospital Patient Protection Act"; requiring that each health care facility implement a staffing plan that provides minimum direct care registered nursing staffing levels; prohibiting a health care facility from assigning unlicensed personnel to perform functions or tasks that are performed by a licensed or registered nurse; requiring that certain information be provided to each patient who is admitted to a health care facility; requiring that the agency post on its website information regarding health care facilities on which civil penalties have been imposed, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delivery of Nursing Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-10-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1083 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951014Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback