FL H1083 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Florida Hospital Patient Protection Act"; requires health care facilities to implement staffing plan that provides minimum direct care registered nursing staffing levels; prohibits health care facility from assigning unlicensed personnel to perform functions or tasks that are performed licensed or registered nurse; requires agency to post on its website information regarding health care facilities on which civil penalties have been imposed.
Title
Delivery of Nursing Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-12-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S638 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1083 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1083/BillText/Filed/PDF |