FL S0638 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 958
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 958
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to the Florida Motor Vehicle Theft Prevention Authority; repealing provisions relating to a short title, purpose, definitions, establishment, compensation of members, personnel, powers and duties, and expenditures, etc.
Title
Florida Motor Vehicle Theft Prevention Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1110 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 958 | |
2012-03-07 | Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 -HJ 1154 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1154 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1115 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -HJ 1101 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1101 | |
2012-02-10 | In Messages | |
2012-02-08 | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 345 | |
2012-02-08 | Read 3rd time -SJ 345 | |
2012-02-07 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-07 | Read 2nd time -SJ 321 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/12 | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 314 | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 -SJ 314 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/01/12, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Budget -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-25 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations, 01/25/12, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2012-01-13 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 160 | |
2012-01-12 | Now in Budget -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-12 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 54 | |
2012-01-09 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/12/12, 10:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-12-05 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 111 | |
2011-12-05 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 111 | |
2011-11-28 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/05/11, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 54 | |
2011-10-21 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
860 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
860 | 152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
860 | 153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
860 | 154 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
860 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
860 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
860 | 157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
860 | 158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |