FL S0634 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Florida Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia Training Act"; requiring the Department of Elderly Affairs or its designee to develop or approve certain dementia-related training by a specified date; requiring the department or its designee to issue unique identifiers to approved training providers; providing that certain employees do not need to repeat certain training when changing employment, under certain circumstances; requiring certain employees to receive additional training within a specified timeframe if the employing entity advertises that it provides certain special care for individuals with Alzheimer's disease or related disorders, etc.
Title
Dementia-related Staff Training
Sponsors
Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] | Sen. Dennis Baxley [R] |
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] | Sen. Victor Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/30/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/23/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/10/21, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H309 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 1755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 4785 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 6045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 178 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 5025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |