FL S0628 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Chapter No. 2021-115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Chapter No. 2021-115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing farm equipment used to transport farm products to be stored, maintained, or repaired within specified boundaries; exempting farm equipment used in urban agriculture from provisions requiring farm equipment to be located within specified boundaries; providing that nonresidential farm buildings, fences, or signs located on lands used for urban agriculture are not exempt from the Florida Building Code or local governmental regulations; creating the "Urban Agriculture Pilot Project Act"; authorizing the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to approve municipal urban agricultural pilot projects, etc.
Title
Urban Agriculture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#394 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Chapter No. 2021-115 | |
2021-06-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-28 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2021-04-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021) |
2021-04-26 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-04-14 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (818054) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/21 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/06/21, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/16/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/03/21, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1013 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 628 (Ch. 2021-115)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
604 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
604 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
604 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |