FL S0624 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the Department of Corrections from placing a youth in solitary confinement except under certain circumstances; authorizing a youth to be placed in emergency confinement if certain conditions are met; requiring that, within a specified timeframe and at specified intervals, a mental health clinician conduct certain evaluations of a youth who is in emergency confinement, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth in Solitary Confinement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-07SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-04SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-01-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H755 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H499 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S110 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944279Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98528Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9854415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985601Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback