FL S0614 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6003
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6003
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishing the Participant Local Government Advisory Council, etc.
Title
Participant Local Government Advisory Council
Sponsors
Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Bill Montford [D] | Sen. David Simmons [R] | Sen. Bobby Powell [D] |
Sen. Annette Taddeo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 6003 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted HB 6003 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/08/18, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2018-01-17 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6003 (Same As) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-140
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
218 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |