FL S0610 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing obsolete language; making technical changes, etc.
Title
Registration of Residential Child-caring Agencies and Family Foster Homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2023-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H367 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee