FL S0604 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 197
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 197
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the terms "abandoned" or "abandonment"; providing that certain state laws relating to children do not supersede the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act; requiring the Department of Children and Families to ensure that the act is observed in certain cases, etc.
Title
Servicemembers Civil Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 197 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 197 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/05/20, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H197 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-65
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |