FL S0598 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising a reference to the deadline for a person who cast a provisional ballot to present evidence verifying authenticity of certain information in a voter registration application, to conform; requiring the supervisor to allow a person who voted a provisional ballot to present identification and submit an affidavit to cure an unsigned Provisional Ballot Voter's Certificate and Affirmation or a provisional ballot rejected due to a signature discrepancy, etc.
Title
Canvassing of Provisional Ballots
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-04-05 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 04/04/17, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0105 (Similar To) 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-45
S0544 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2017-45)
H0733 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2017-45)
S0954 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2017-45)
S0544 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2017-45)
H0733 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2017-45)
S0954 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2017-45)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |