FL H0105 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying and clarifying provisions governing the canvassing of vote-by-mail ballots; authorizing use of the vote-by-mail ballot cure affidavit if an elector's signature does not match the signature in the registration books or precinct register; specifying that a Florida driver license or Florida identification card are acceptable forms of identification for purposes of curing a vote-by-mail ballot, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Canvassing of Vote-by-mail Ballots

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#421 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-02 Chapter No. 2017-45
2017-06-02 Approved by Governor
2017-05-18 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-03HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2017-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 120 NAYS 0 1091
2017-05-03HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (762384) 1090
2017-04-12HouseIn returning messages
2017-04-06SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2017-04-06SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-04SenateAmendment(s) adopted (762384)
2017-04-04SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-04SenateSubstituted for SB 954
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-04SenateWithdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules
2017-04-04SenateReceived
2017-04-03SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules
2017-03-29SenateIn Messages
2017-03-23HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2017-03-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-03-22HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-03-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/17
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-09HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2017-03-07HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 03/09/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-21HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-02-17HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-02-16HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 02/16/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-01-09HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2016-12-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0544 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2017-45)
S0598 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
H0733 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2017-45)
S0954 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2017-45)
S1160 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2017-45)
H1325 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10168Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback