FL S0598 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-26 - Unfavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability, laid on Table; YEAS 2 NAYS 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-26 - Unfavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability, laid on Table; YEAS 2 NAYS 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the state and political subdivisions that contract for the construction, maintenance, repair, or improvement of public works from imposing restrictive conditions on contractors, subcontractors, or material suppliers or carriers; prohibiting the state and political subdivisions from restricting qualified bidders from submitting bids, etc.
Title
Public Works Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | Senate | Unfavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability, laid on Table; YEAS 2 NAYS 3 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/19/16, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0181 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar