FL H0181 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits state & political subdivisions that contract for public works projects from imposing restrictive conditions on certain contractors, subcontractors, or material suppliers or carriers; prohibits state & political subdivisions from restricting qualified bidders from submitting bids or being awarded contracts; provides applicability.
Title
Public Works Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died on Calendar |
2016-01-26 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2016-01-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/26/16 |
2016-01-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-14 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-01-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-13 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 6 |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/13/16, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-11-17 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2015-11-06 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-11-04 | House | CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2015-10-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 11/04/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-10-20 | House | Now in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee |
2015-10-20 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 4 |
2015-10-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 10/20/15, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-09-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0598 (Similar To) 2016-01-26 - Unfavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability, laid on Table; YEAS 2 NAYS 3