FL S0596 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-52, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 186 (Ch. 2015-12)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the term "branded product"; revising the current limitation on the number of containers that may be sold to consumers by craft distilleries; applying such limitation to individual containers for each branded product; prohibiting a craft distillery from shipping or arranging to ship any of its distilled spirits to consumers; requiring the Department of Transportation to install directional signs at specified locations in accordance with Florida's Highway Guide Sign Program upon the request of a craft distillery licensed in this state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Craft Distilleries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#375 (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-52, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 186 (Ch. 2015-12)
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-28SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-28HouseCS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 1
2015-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-27HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 263
2015-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-24HouseReceived
2015-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15
2015-04-24HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-23HouseIn Messages
2015-04-23SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2015-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-22SenateOrdered engrossed
2015-04-22SenateAmendment(s) adopted (227916)
2015-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-14SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-09SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
2015-04-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-04-02SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-04-01SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2015-04-01SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-30SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2015-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-17SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2015-03-17SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2015-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-11SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2015-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/11/15, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-05SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Fiscal Policy
2015-01-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0263 (Similar To) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 596 (Ch. 2015-52), CS/CS/SB 186 (Ch. 2015-12)
S0186 (Similar To) 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 596 (Ch. 2015-52)
H0301 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 186 (Ch. 2015-12), CS/CS/SB 596 (Ch. 2015-52)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
56503Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/596
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/Amendment/307010/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/Amendment/622348/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/Amendment/124280/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/Amendment/805354/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/Amendment/413416/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/Amendment/227916/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/Vote/SenateVote_s0596e1014.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0596/Vote/HouseVote_s0596e1375.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback