FL S0588 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 409 (Ch. 2014-200)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 409 (Ch. 2014-200)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising when an out-of-court statement by an elderly person or disabled adult is admissible in certain proceedings; deleting a requirement that property of an elderly person or disabled adult be obtained by deception or intimidation in order to constitute exploitation of such a person; creating a presumption that certain inter vivos transfers are a result of exploitation, etc.
Title
Offenses Against Vulnerable Persons
Sponsors
Senate Judiciary Committee | Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Garrett Richter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 409 (Ch. 2014-200) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 409 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | CS/CS by- Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/31/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/18/14, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Judiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0409 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-200
H1029 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 409 (Ch. 2014-200)
S1472 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 409 (Ch. 2014-200)
H1029 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 409 (Ch. 2014-200)
S1472 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 409 (Ch. 2014-200)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
772 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0844 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 568 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
825 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
825 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |