FL S0578 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 223
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting vessels under a specified weight from remaining in certain marinas that have been deemed unsuitable for refuge during a hurricane after the issuance of a hurricane watch; requiring a marina owner, operator, employee, or agent to remove specified vessels under certain circumstances; providing that such owner, operator, employee, or agent may charge the vessel owner a reasonable fee for such removal and may not be held liable for any damages as a result of such removal, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marina Evacuations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 223
2021-04-14SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 223
2021-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/21
2021-03-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-03-04SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/04/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-02-17SenateNow in Rules
2021-02-16SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/16/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-02-01SenateNow in Transportation
2021-02-01SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2021-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/01/21, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-01-21SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Transportation; Rules
2021-01-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H223 (Same As) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-108

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32759Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578/BillText/Filed/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578/Analyses/2021s00578.pre.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578/Analyses/2021s00578.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578/Analyses/2021s00578.pre.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578/Analyses/2021s00578.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578/Analyses/2021s00578.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578/Analyses/2021s00578.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578/Vote/2021-02-01%200230PM~S00578%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578/Vote/2021-02-16%200330PM~S00578%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/578/Vote/2021-03-04%200900AM~S00578%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback