FL H0223 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits vessels under specified weight from remaining in certain marinas that have been deemed unsuitable for refuge during hurricane after issuance of hurricane watch; requires marina owner, operator, employee, or agent to remove specified vessels; provides that such owner, operator, employee, or agent may charge vessel owner reasonable fee for such removal & may not be held liable for any damages as result of such removal; provides that owners or operators of certain vessels may be subject to fine that deepwater seaport issuing evacuation order may impose & collect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marina Evacuations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17 Chapter No. 2021-108
2021-06-16 Approved by Governor
2021-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-14HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-14HouseIn Messages
2021-04-14SenateImmediately certified
2021-04-14SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-14SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-14SenateSubstituted for SB 578
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-14SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2021-04-08SenateReceived
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Rules
2021-04-07HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-07SenateIn Messages
2021-04-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
2021-04-01HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-31HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-03-31HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-03-31HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-25HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021)
2021-03-22HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-22HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-03-18House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-03-18HouseCS Filed
2021-03-18HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-18HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2021-03-17HouseFavorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
2021-03-15HouseAdded to State Affairs Committee agenda
2021-03-12HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2021-03-12HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-10House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-10HouseCS Filed
2021-03-10HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-10HouseReported out of Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with CS by Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-03-05HouseAdded to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-16HouseNow in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-02-16HouseReported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-02-16HouseFavorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-02-09HouseAdded to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture and Flooding Subcommittee; Pandemics and Public Emergencies Committee; State Affairs Committee
2021-01-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S578 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 223

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32759Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Amendment/004745/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Analyses/h0223.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Analyses/h0223a.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Analyses/h0223b.PPE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Analyses/h0223c.PPE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Analyses/h0223d.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Analyses/h0223e.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Analyses/h0223z.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Analyses/h0223z1.EAF.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Vote/HouseVote_h00223c2035.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/223/Vote/SenateVote_h00223c2010.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=56716&IsPCB=0&BillId=70278
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57819&IsPCB=0&BillId=70278
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58603&IsPCB=0&BillId=70278

Bill Comments 750

feedback