FL S0566 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Creating a Respectful and Open World for Natural Hair Act" or "CROWN Act"; providing that it is unlawful for sponsors under the Florida Housing Finance Corporation Act to discriminate against any person or family because of traits historically associated with race, etc.
Title
Prohibited Discrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H761 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |