FL S0564 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising eligibility requirements for aftercare services for certain young adults; authorizing the Department of Children and Families to distribute federal funds to eligible young adults in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Young Adult Aftercare Services
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Ileana Garcia [R] | Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#881 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Chapter No. 2024-112 | |
2024-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 32 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (174048) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 01/17/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-10 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H631 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table