FL S0564 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that parents of certain students who are seeking an individual education plan reevaluation may request a specified meeting and evaluation from the school district; defining the term "hospitalized or homebound"; specifying that a school district may change a student's matrix of services as a result of an individual education plan reevaluation, etc.
Title
John M. McKay Scholarships for Students with Disabilities Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | CS by Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/18/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 01/10/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H399 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee