FL S0550 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 617 (Ch. 2019-82)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 617 (Ch. 2019-82)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that homeowners' insurance policies offering specified flood insurance coverage may omit a portion of a specified statement which relates to flood insurance, etc.
Title
Homeowners' Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 617 (Ch. 2019-82) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H617 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-82
S380 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 617 (Ch. 2019-82)
S380 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 617 (Ch. 2019-82)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/550 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/550/BillText/Filed/HTML |