FL S0380 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/19/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Hearing: Feb 19 @ 12:30 pm in 412 Knott Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising circumstances under which insurers issuing homeowners' insurance policies must include a specified statement relating to flood insurance with the policy documents at initial issuance and renewals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners' Insurance Policies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/19/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-01-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H617 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6277011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback