FL S0550 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supporting an extension of the current moratorium on drilling in the Gulf of Mexico east of the Military Mission Line, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gulf of Mexico Range Complex

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08SenateAdopted
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-26SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-25SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/25/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-16SenateNow in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/16/18, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
2017-10-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H319 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - Adopted

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback